HI HR11 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR11
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Submit A Report To The Legislature On The Implementation Of The Amended Chapters 19 And 89 Of Title 8, Hawaii Administrative Rules.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Submit A Report To The Legislature On The Implementation Of The Amended Chapters 19 And 89 Of Title 8, Hawaii Administrative Rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2020-01-21 | House | Offered |
2020-01-17 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR13 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
HR11 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
SR8 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
HR11 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
SR8 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=11&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR11_.HTM |