HI HR107 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct An Analysis Regarding The Scope Of Practice For Advanced Practice Registered Nurses And Physician Assistants.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct An Analysis Regarding The Scope Of Practice For Advanced Practice Registered Nurses And Physician Assistants.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, La Chica voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2). |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2001) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2023-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, La Chica voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6). |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC/LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1796) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Morikawa, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Matsumoto. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Lowen. |
2023-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC/LMG on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to CPC/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR100 (Same As) 2023-04-11 - Referred to HHS.