HI HCR94 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Increasing The Medicaid Reimbursement Payment Rate For Hawaii's Community Care Foster Family Homes And Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes For Medicaid Clients In 2032 And Every Ten Years Thereafter.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Increasing The Medicaid Reimbursement Payment Rate For Hawaii's Community Care Foster Family Homes And Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes For Medicaid Clients In 2032 And Every Ten Years Thereafter.
Sponsors
Rep. Rachele Fernandez Lamosao [D] | Rep. Micah Aiu [D] | Rep. Cory Chun [D] | Rep. Andrew Garrett [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2024-04-26 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-26 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Quinlan excused (2). |
2024-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-25 | House | One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-26-24. |
2024-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 744) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-24. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3915) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to HHS. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 04-17-24 8:45AM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1698-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
2024-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR78 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Community Care Foster Family Homes
Department of Human Services
Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes
Medicaid
Reimbursement
Department of Human Services
Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes
Medicaid
Reimbursement