HI HCR94 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging All State Agencies To Retrofit Street Lights And Other Outdoor Lamp Lighting Fixtures With Energy Efficient Light-emitting Diode Bulbs, Where Appropriate.
Title
Street Lights; LED Lights; Energy Efficiency
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-25-15 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-12 | House | Offered |
2015-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR50 (Same As) 2015-03-25 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=94&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR94_.HTM |