HI HCR87 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR87

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Director Of Health Convene A Working Group To Conduct A Study Relating To Prescription Drug Affordability Review And Rate Setting And Submit Proposed Legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Director Of Health Convene A Working Group To Conduct A Study Relating To Prescription Drug Affordability Review And Rate Setting And Submit Proposed Legislation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2020-03-12HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2020-03-11HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 40
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-04HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR68 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
HCR87 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback