HI HCR84 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR84
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Establishing A North Road Task Force To Study The Transfer Of North Road To The City And County Of Honolulu.
Title
Relating To Establishing A North Road Task Force To Study The Transfer Of North Road To The City And County Of Honolulu.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR67 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
HCR84 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to PVM/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR84 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to PVM/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=84&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR84_.HTM |