HI HCR70 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR70
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Sale Of A Lease Of Certain Submerged Lands At Kaneohe Bay, Kaneohe, Oahu, For Recreational Boat Pier Purposes, By Public Auction.
Title
Authorizing The Sale Of A Lease Of Certain Submerged Lands At Kaneohe Bay, Kaneohe, Oahu, For Recreational Boat Pier Purposes, By Public Auction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 819). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1783) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1733), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-09-21 1:30PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 350). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1583), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124), recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-18-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 23 |
2021-03-09 | House | Offered |
2021-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR70 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR59 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR59 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.