HI HR59 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR59
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Sale Of A Lease Of Certain Submerged Lands At Kaneohe Bay, Kaneohe, Oahu, For Recreational Boat Pier Purposes, By Public Auction.
Title
Authorizing The Sale Of A Lease Of Certain Submerged Lands At Kaneohe Bay, Kaneohe, Oahu, For Recreational Boat Pier Purposes, By Public Auction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-18-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 23 |
2021-03-09 | House | Offered |
2021-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR59 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR70 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR70 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=59&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HR59_.HTM |