HI HCR39 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Begin Monthly Testing Of Pacific Ocean And Seafood Products And The United Nations General Assembly To Establish An International Independent Commission Of Experts To Assess The Safety Of And Risk Of Radiation In Seafood Products From The Pacific Ocean.
Title
Fukushima Radiation
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2014-02-11 | House | Offered |
2014-02-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR21 (Same As) 2014-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=39&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR39_.HTM |