HI HCR36 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR36
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Executive Office On Aging To Evaluate The Need For Senior Centers Across The State And Propose An Expansion Of The Base Amount Of Funding For Senior Centers In The Supplemental Budget For Fiscal Year 2018-2019.
Title
Requesting The Executive Office On Aging To Evaluate The Need For Senior Centers Across The State And Propose An Expansion Of The Base Amount Of Funding For Senior Centers In The Supplemental Budget For Fiscal Year 2018-2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2017-02-07 | House | Offered |
2017-02-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR36 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 16
SCR17 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
SCR17 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=36&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR36_.HTM |