HI HCR36 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR36
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Financial Audit Of The Attorney General's Expenditure Of Moneys From The Notaries Public Revolving Fund During Fiscal Years 2010-2014.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Financial Audit Of The Attorney General's Expenditure Of Moneys From The Notaries Public Revolving Fund During Fiscal Years 2010-2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to JDC/WAM. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 422). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1673-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott. |
2018-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2018-02-20 | House | Offered |
2018-02-16 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR36 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 16
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=36&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR36_.HTM |