HI HCR222 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Convene A Task Force To Consider The Feasibility Of Divesting Public Investments From Fossil Fuels.
Title
DBEDT; Divestiture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Yamane. |
2015-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR155 (Same As) 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).