HI HCR194 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Support For The National Draft To Include Women.
Title
US Women's Draft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-27-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR155 (Same As) 2013-03-27 - The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=194&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR194_.HTM |