HI HCR166 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR166

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Supporting The Finalization And Execution Of The University Of Hawaii's Transfer Of The Operation And Lands Of Waialee Livestock Experiment Station To The Agribusiness Development Corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting The Finalization And Execution Of The University Of Hawaii's Transfer Of The Operation And Lands Of Waialee Livestock Experiment Station To The Agribusiness Development Corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2018-04-19HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 797).
2018-04-19SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2018-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-19-18.
2018-04-18SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3789) with recommendation of adoption.
2018-04-16SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2018-04-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-18 1:25PM in conference room 211.
2018-04-12SenateRe-Referred to WAM.
2018-04-10SenateReferred to HRE/AEN/WTL, WAM.
2018-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 439).
2018-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2018-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5).
2018-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1800-18), recommending adoption.
2018-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308.
2018-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-03-28HouseReported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1702-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-27HouseThe committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Onishi, Matsumoto.
2018-03-23HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2018-03-16HouseRe-referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 42
2018-03-13HouseReferred to AGR/HED, FIN, referral sheet 39
2018-03-09HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR143 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR166 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback