HI HCR148 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR148
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Examine And Develop Recommendations To Address The Issue Of Squatting In The State.
Title
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Examine And Develop Recommendations To Address The Issue Of Squatting In The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 644). |
2017-05-02 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tupola excused (2). |
2017-05-02 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2017-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 705) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-17. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1695) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-17 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 446). |
2017-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3). |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1655), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro. |
2017-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1406), recommending referral to JUD. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR148 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR95 (Same As) 2017-04-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR95 (Same As) 2017-04-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.