HI HR95 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR95
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Examine And Develop Recommendations To Address The Issue Of Squatting In The State.
Title
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Examine And Develop Recommendations To Address The Issue Of Squatting In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-06 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3). |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1654), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro. |
2017-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1405), recommending referral to JUD. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR95 (Carry Over) 2017-04-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR148 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR148 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=95&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HR95_.HTM |