HI HCR122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR122
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board, And Other Concerned Agencies Or Judicial Bodies, To Take Notice Of The Legislature's Intent To Enable Exclusive Representatives To Maintain Financial Viability And Organizational Capacity And Effectively Represent Public Employees, And To Remove Or Reduce Financial Incentives For Employees To "free Ride".
Title
Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board, And Other Concerned Agencies Or Judicial Bodies, To Take Notice Of The Legislature's Intent To Enable Exclusive Representatives To Maintain Financial Viability And Organizational Capacity And Effectively Represent Public Employees, And To Remove Or Reduce Financial Incentives For Employees To "free Ride".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to LAB, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR106 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR122 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR122 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=122&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR122_.HTM |