HI HB998 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Marumoto voting no (1) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Marumoto voting no (1) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires businesses in the State to collect a 5-cent fee for each single-use checkout bag provided to a customer. Allows for exemptions. Provides for fees to be deposited in the general fund. Requires fees to be collected on paper bags in counties that currently have ordinances banning plastic bags. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB998 HD1)
Title
Environmental Protection; Plastic Checkout Bags; Fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Marumoto voting no (1) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from EEP/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Tsuji, Pine; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Carroll, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Herkes; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Ito. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-15-11 11:45AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-15-11 at 11:45AM in room 325. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/ERB on Thursday, 02-10-11 11:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to EEP/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to EEP, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |