HI HB996 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB996
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Contractors License Board to adopt rules to define "incidental and supplemental to the performance of work" to clarify the percentage of a craft or trade in which a specialty contractor may engage without a license while performing work in a craft and trade for which contractor is licensed.
Title
Relating To Specialty Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB996 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 4
SB1102 (Same As) 2017-02-24 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB1102 (Same As) 2017-02-24 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=996&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB996_.HTM |