HI HB988 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals various non-general funds and accounts, transfers unencumbered balances to the general fund, and reclassifies selected special funds to revolving funds, as recommended by the auditor in report no. 14-18.
Title
Non-General Funds; Repeal; Transfer of Balances ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=988&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB988_.HTM |