HI HB979 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Transportation to adopt rules to impose upon private parties who use state commercial harbors the duty to defend, indemnify, and hold harmless the State against claims that arise from such use. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB979 HD1)
Title
Harbors; Indemnification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 13 |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN/WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1210 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to TIA/JDL, WAM.