HI HB953 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a vehicle for conforming amendments to the Hawaii income tax law based upon amendments to the Internal Revenue Code made in calendar year 2012.
Title
Income Tax; Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Act 043, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=953&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB953_.htm |