HI HB897 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act to reflect requirements of the Hague Convention of the International Recovery on Child Support and Other Forms of Family Maintenance. Provides procedures for registration, recognition, enforcement, and modifications of support orders from countries that are parties to the convention. (HB897 HD2)
Title
Uniform Interstate Family Support Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 69) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1066 (Same As)