HI HB893 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB893
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of the Attorney General to have law enforcement vehicles, with colored lights, that are recognized authorized emergency vehicles.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1047 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB893 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB893 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=893&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB893_.HTM |