HI SB1047 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1047
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of the Attorney General to have law enforcement vehicles, with colored lights, that are recognized authorized emergency vehicles.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB893 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1047 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
SB1047 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1047&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1047_.HTM |