HI HB891 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 183, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates the sale and use of electric guns and cartridges. Repeals the prohibition on the possession, sale, offer for sale, give, lend, or delivery of any electric gun. Effective 1/1/2022. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electric Guns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07HouseAct 183, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
2021-07-07SenateAct 183, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
2021-04-28HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2021-04-28SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
2021-04-28HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
2021-04-27HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Tokioka voting no (4) and none excused (0).
2021-04-27SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none).
2021-04-23Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
2021-04-23SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 165).
2021-04-23HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21.
2021-04-23HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 165) as amended in (CD 1).
2021-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Nakashima, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 3:15PM in conference room CR 325.
2021-04-22SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
2021-04-21HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 3:45PM in conference room CR 325.
2021-04-21HouseHouse Conferees Added: Representative Cullen added as Co-Chair.
2021-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 3:45PM in conference room CR 325.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
2021-04-19HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809).
2021-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Keohokalole, Fevella.
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2021-04-16HouseRe-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 36
2021-04-09SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 395).
2021-04-08HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2021-04-07HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 613) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-04-07SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-21.
2021-04-05SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
2021-04-05SenateFloor Amendment No. 4 offered.
2021-03-31Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-21.
2021-03-31SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-31SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1517) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard.
2021-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-03-12SenateRe-Referred to JDC.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 261).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
2021-03-05HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-03HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward.
2021-03-01HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HouseRe-referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 16
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Quinlan, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 237) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-04HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and Excused: none.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1045 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback