HI HB863 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - (S) Act 008, 4/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - (S) Act 008, 4/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the date when the Hawaii Health Authority is required to submit its findings and recommendations to the Legislature.
Title
Hawaii Health Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | (S) Act 008, 4/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108). | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Act 008, on 4/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 378). | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Hee, Kim, Kouchi). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) One Day Notice 03-24-11. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to HTH. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 183). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 488), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ching. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-15-11 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=863 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB863_.HTM |