HI HB831 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB831
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to limit the terms of members of the legislature to a maximum of sixteen years in the house of representatives or senate, or both, for terms beginning after the general election of 2024.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Iii, Section 4, Of The Hawaii State Constitution To Establish Legislative Term Limits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB831 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=831&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB831_.HTM |