HI HB831 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB831
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases administrative and criminal penalties for those who violate the Hawaii pesticides law.
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB831 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2
SB499 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
SB499 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=831&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB831_.HTM |