HI SB499 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases administrative and criminal penalties for those who violate the Hawaii pesticides law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Pesticides.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08SenateThe committee on AEN deferred the measure.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to AEN, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB831 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback