PA HB2310 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Act No. 54 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Act No. 54 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency COVID-19 response, further
Title
In emergency COVID-19 response, further
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05537 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2310 PN 3506, Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2310 PN 3506, CONCURRENCE (Y: 125 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2310 PN 3140, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 162 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2310 PN 3140, 2023 A4788 (Y: 99 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-06-03 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05537 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2310 PN 3506, Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2310 PN 3506, CONCURRENCE (Y: 125 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2310 PN 3140, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 162 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2310 PN 3140, 2023 A4788 (Y: 99 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-06-03 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | House | Act No. 54 of 2024 |
2024-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2024-07-11 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2024-07-11 | House | Signed in Senate |
2024-07-11 | House | Signed in House |
2024-07-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (125-77) |
2024-07-11 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2024-07-11 | House | Referred to RULES |
2024-07-11 | House | In the House |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-4) |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2024-06-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-06-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (162-39) |
2024-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-10 | House | Second consideration |
2024-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2024-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2024-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-05-21 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |