HI HB827 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Act 004, 3/10/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Act 004, 3/10/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to provide for the expenses of the Legislature, Auditor, Legislative Reference Bureau, Ombudsman, Ethics Commission, and the Legislative Broadcasting Program. (HB827 HD1)
Title
Legislative Appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (S) Act 004, 3/10/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104). | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Act 004, on 3/10/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104). | |
2011-03-09 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 48). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) One Day Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 612) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Fukunaga, Kim. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-11 3:15PM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-07-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-07-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 17). | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Say, Takai excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 419) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The votes in FIN were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 02-11-11. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by FIN on Wednesday, 02-16-11 2:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-11-11 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |