HI HB813 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB813
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOE to consult with exclusive representatives of appropriate bargaining units in establishing an evaluation program for teachers and educational officers. Prohibits a DOE evaluation program from affecting the compensation or employment status of any teacher or educational officer. Repeals provisions requiring a particular frequency and basis of evaluations.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB813 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=813&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB813_.HTM |