HI HB76 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes explicit the counties' authority to enact ordinances to amortize or phase out permitted, nonconforming, or otherwise allowed short-term rentals in any zoning classification. Includes swapping, bartering, or exchange of a residential dwelling, or portion thereof, in definition of "short-term rental" for this purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Counties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HSG, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB187 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback