HI HB740 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the possession or storage of an open container holding intoxicating liquor on any sidewalk or common area within any public housing project under the jurisdiction of the Hawaii public housing authority
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Intoxicating Liquor; Prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 921) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-11-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-09-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 106). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 638), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, C. Lee, Wooley. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-21-13 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-21-13. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-15-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 176), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Kobayashi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-04-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |