HI HB729 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows charter schools to use appropriated funds for facilities improvement, rental, and construction and other infrastructure improvements. Appropriates funds for facilities and infrastructure improvement.
Title
Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB729 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB912 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB912 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=729&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB729_.HTM |