HI HB717 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the group of persons required to report child abuse and neglect to include family members, unless they are victims of domestic violence. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB717 HD1)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect; Family Members; Mandated Reporting
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Pine. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-07-11 9:35AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |