HI HB713 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits employers from requiring or requesting employees and potential employees to grant access to personal account usernames and passwords. Effective January 1, 2100. (SD1)
Title
Personal Account; Privacy; Employment
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TEC/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TEC/CPN, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fukumoto, Ito, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 828) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, C. Lee, Wooley. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-21-13 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-21-13. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-15-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 322) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-08-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |