HI HB681 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows dogs in restaurants at the restaurant owner's or manager's discretion provided that certain conditions are met. (HB681 HD1)
Title
Relating To Dogs.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-30 | House | Re-referred to AGR, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 8 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT/AGR, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB681 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB1152 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH, JDC.
SB1152 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH, JDC.