HI HB678 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB678
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an employee to take family leave to seek safety, medical attention, or victim services related to domestic or sexual violence against the employee or the employee's minor child. Specifies certification and confidentiality requirements. (HB678 HD1)
Title
Relating To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 698) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB678 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
SB516 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
SB516 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.