HI HB66 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB66
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the process for electing members to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs Board of Trustees. Requires the Reapportionment Commission to establish a reapportionment plan for the members of the Board of Trustees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs so that they are elected according to their respective districts, rather than an at-large statewide election for each seat.
Title
Relating To The Election Of Members To The Board Of Trustees Of The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB52 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB66 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB66 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=66&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB66_.HTM |