HI HB658 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB658
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the process for electing members to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs Board of Trustees. Requires the Reapportionment Commission to establish a reapportionment plan based on basic island units for the members of the Board of Trustees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs so that they are elected according to their respective districts, rather than an at-large statewide election for each seat.
Title
Relating To The Election Of Members To The Board Of Trustees Of The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB658 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB195 (Same As) 2021-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB195 (Same As) 2021-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=658&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB658_.HTM |