HI SB195 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the process for electing members to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs Board of Trustees. Requires the Reapportionment Commission to establish a reapportionment plan for the members of the Board of Trustees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs so that they are elected according to their respective districts, rather than an at-large statewide election for each seat. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Election Of Members To The Board Of Trustees Of The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-05SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2021-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HWN, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB658 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback