LA HB782 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Title
Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 782 FINAL PASSAGE (#723) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-24 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 4 for 04/25/2024. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (20-0). |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |