CA SB1318 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 7 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 7 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 215 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: suicide prevention policies: pupil suicide crisis.
Sponsors
Sen. Aisha Wahab [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1318 Wahab et al (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1318 Wahab et al (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 12). |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 4094.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3979.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3466.) (April 3). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |