HI HB650 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets 15-day time limit for fulfilling condo unit owner's requests for documents, etc. and requires access to the same by Internet download. Requires access to financial documents and association meeting minutes at manager's office on property and via email or mail. Subjects board members to breach of fiduciary duty for noncompliance. (HB650 HD1)
Title
Relating To Real Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-17 2:15PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-17. |
2017-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-02-17 3:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB650 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).