HI HB65 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public hearings for the licensing of a new special treatment facility, or for renewal of such a license, to include residents within a two hundred yard radius. Effective July 1, 2250. (HB65 HD1)
Title
Special Treatment Facility; Public Hearing
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 495) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ching. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-15-11 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-15-11 at 10:30am. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-11-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |