HI HB64 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB64
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires individuals denied a firearm permit or otherwise disqualified from possessing firearms and certain defendants to provide a sworn statement that the individual has disposed of any firearms and ammunition in the individual's possession. Requires the applicable chief of police to search firearm permit and registration records for those individuals before serving a protective order or restraining order involving firearms or ammunition, and to seize any firearms or ammunition that were not disposed of. Requires police to seize firearms and ammunition in domestic abuse cases that are in plain view of the officer or discovered by consensual search.
Title
Relating To Firearms Possession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB64 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
SB53 (Same As) 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
SB53 (Same As) 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=64&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB64_.HTM |