HI HB632 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB632
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the sales of mobility enhancing equipment sold by prescription, prosthetic devices, prescription drugs sold pursuant to a prescription, diabetic supplies, medical oxygen, human blood and its derivatives, and durable medical equipment, from the general excise tax for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018. Amends the definitions of "prosthetic device" and "prescription drugs". (HB632 HD1)
Title
Relating To The General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 66). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 815), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB632 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
SB332 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
SB332 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPH, WAM.