HI HB603 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the use of deadly force when protecting one's primary dwelling against an intruder who enters the primary dwelling without invitation. Exempts the actor from civil liability for injuries or damages resulting from the use of deadly force. Repeals section 663-1.57, HRS.
Title
Justification; Use of Deadly Force
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=603&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB603_.HTM |